Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Foreign Government Employer-Sponsored Retirement Plans
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from retirement plans qualified under certain laws of a foreign government within a certain subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax only if it is attributable to work performed within the United States in collaboration with the United States Government for certain individuals who are at least 65 years of age or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Foreign Government Employer-Sponsored Retirement Plans
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM