Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Elfreth, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing, in Anne Arundel County, a gift basket permit; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to issue the permit to persons whose primary business is the sale of gift baskets; authorizing a permit holder to sell and deliver gift baskets containing beer, wine, or liquor to certain individuals; requiring a permit holder to maintain certain records and submit certain reports; limiting the total annual sales from alcoholic beverages to 25% of the annual gross sales of the permit holder; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0714
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {394035/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47B
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:17 AM