Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Hough, Conway, Benson, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Ready, Salling, and Young
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield court records and police records relating to specified convictions at a specified time; providing that, if a person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction is not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; providing that a person is not eligible for shielding if the person is a defendant in a pending criminal proceeding; authorizing the court to grant a specified petition for good cause; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0244
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388272/2
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388272/2
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {388272/2 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted 39
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {388272/2 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary 43A
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM