Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Colburn, Jones-Rodwell, King, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the policy of the State on public-private partnerships; authorizing a reporting agency to establish a public-private partnership and execute an agreement in connection with specified functions, services, or assets; requiring a reporting agency to adopt regulations and establish processes for the development, solicitation, evaluation, award, and delivery of public-private partnerships; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0560
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
1/31/2013 Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships
(   10A-101, 10A-102, 10A-102 through 10A-105, 10A-201 through 10A-204, 10A-301, 10A-401 through 10A-403, 11-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page