Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation Board
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the purposes of the Baltimore Metropolitan Council; altering the membership of the Council; requiring the Council to make a specified report annually to the General Assembly; repealing provisions of law that establish the Baltimore Metropolitan Council Advisory board; establishing the Baltimore Region Transportation Board; providing for the purpose and composition of the Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207977/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments {207977/1 Report Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 42
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 45
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301, 13-302, 13-303, 13-304, 13-305, 13-306, 13-307, 13-308, 13-309 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM