Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Providing Alcohol to Underage Drinkers - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Brochin, Cassilly, Gladden, Hough, Kagan, King, Lee, Manno, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing penalties for a first offense to a maximum imprisonment of 1 year or a fine not to exceed $5,000 or both for the violation of specified prohibitions relating to obtaining or furnishing alcoholic beverages to an individual under the age of 21 years or allowing an individual under the age of 21 years to possess or consume alcoholic beverages under specified circumstances; increasing penalties for a second or subsequent offense of specified violations to a maximum imprisonment of 2 years or a fine not to exceed $7,500 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {338770/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {322515/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2)
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {338770/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary 38
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {322515/1 Report Adopted 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58A
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2) 59
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-116, 10-117, 10-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM