Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for making a specified complaint against a law enforcement officer for a reason that may lead to a specified action; altering the individuals who may conduct a specified investigation, interrogation, or hearing against a specified law enforcement officer; requiring confidentiality of specified information under specified circumstances; providing for the suspension of a law enforcement officer's police powers during a specified investigation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0968
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-104, 3-106, 3-107, 3-108, 3-110, 3-112 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM