Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Young, Conway, Simonaire, Bates, Salling, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance; and providing a penalty of a maximum fine of $1,000 for violation of the Act.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0937 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {744438/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 39
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {603691/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-30) 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 57
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 House Refuses to Recede 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senators Young, Simonaire, and Rosapepe 61A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 House Refuses to Recede 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-326, 6-327, 6-328, 6-329 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM