Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the prohibition against operating or riding on a motorcycle without specified protective headgear does not apply to an individual at least 21 years old who carries at least $10,000 in health insurance coverage for injuries that may be incurred in a motorcycle accident.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0173 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM