Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Colburn, Currie, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Jacobs, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding as a father of a child a man who has committed a specified sexual crime against the child's mother for purposes of specified provisions relating to the paternity of a child in a guardianship or adoption proceeding under specified circumstances; requiring a court to consider a specified statement when making a specified finding; prohibiting a court from requiring publication of specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0715
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0815 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judiciary 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-306, 5-3A-06, 5-3B-05, 9-101.2 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM