Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Manno, Muse, Peters, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 50% of an investment, not to exceed $50,000 or $100,000 for a qualified investor that is a married couple filing jointly or a pass-through entity, made in a qualified innovation business; requiring a qualified investor to meet specified requirements in order to be eligible for the credit; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to administer the credit; applying the Act to specified taxable years after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0471
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0584 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:40 PM