Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified information that a title insurer is required to include in specified disclosures; providing that a title insurance commitment or a specified sample form constitutes a specified written statement, is not a representation as to the state of title, and does not constitute a specified abstract; requiring a specified title insurance commitment or sample form to contain a specified statement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0679
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957272/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {957272/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 40
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101, 22-102, 22-103, 22-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM