Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training Center
Sponsored by
Senators King, DeGrange, Forehand, Garagiola, Klausmeier, Manno, Miller, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from hotel rental taxes and transient occupancy taxes imposed by specified counties for the sale of a right to occupy a room or lodgings as a transient guest at specified facilities or campuses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869937/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869937/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-31)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {703625/1 Rejected (10-36)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {509331/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-35)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments {869937/1 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Laid Over (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 40
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments {869937/1 41
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-31) 41
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 41
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {703625/1 Rejected (10-36) 41
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {509331/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 49
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (102-35) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-404, 20-603 )
(   11-1-102 )
(   20.400 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM