Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Kelley, King, and Smith
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified fines to be remitted to the Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund; establishing the Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention (GOCCP) to administer the Fund; providing that the Fund is a continuing, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0941
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288174/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {288174/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Appropriations 46
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-626 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM