Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Hester, Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Sydnor, Washington, West, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain hospitals to provide each patient with a certain written notice related to outpatient facility fees that are charged for services provided at the hospital that is in a certain form; requiring that certain notices be provided to certain patients in certain manners and at certain times; requiring each hospital that charges an outpatient facility fee to use a certain range of fees and fee estimates; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0915
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876081/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {747276/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49A
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {876081/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-349.2 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2020 5:22 PM