Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that 95% of fines, penalties, and forfeitures that are recovered in certain criminal cases concerning controlled dangerous substances, prescriptions, and other substances be used to provide funding for county drug treatment and education programs.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page