Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - County Central Committees - Democratic Party Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Lam)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law concerning the composition of Democratic Party Central Committees in certain counties; requiring the members of each county Democratic Party Central Committee to be elected in accordance with certain rules and bylaws; requiring that the method of election of members of each county Democratic Party Central Committee promote geographic balance to the extent practicable; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - County Central Committees - Democratic Party Requirements
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 40
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lam) Adopted 44
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/10/2020 11:26 AM