Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsored by
Senators Muse and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a rebuttable presumption in specified court proceedings that specified custodial arrangements are in the best interests of a child; and authorizing the court to grant sole custody under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0888
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM