Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health - Down Syndrome - Required Information
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to identify up-to-date, evidence-based, written information about Down Syndrome; requiring the Department to provide the information about Down Syndrome to specified health care facilities and specified health care providers; authorizing specified health care facilities and health care providers to provide specified individuals with specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {597875/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2014 4/02/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments {476883/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70
House 4/07/2014 4/04/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 71
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 66A
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM