Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsored by
Senators King and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Pilot Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims to prevent HIV infection for victims of an alleged rape or sexual offense or victims of alleged child sexual abuse; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the program; requiring that a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse be provided with a full course of treatment and follow-up care for postexposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV infection; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1249
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Text - First - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {598977/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary 46A
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text - Chapter - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:36 AM