Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hough, Norman, Reilly, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum rate of the admissions tax that a county or municipal corporation may set for gross receipts that are also subject to the sales and use tax; altering the rate of the sales and use tax from 6% to 5%; altering the percentage of gross receipts from vending machine sales to which the sales and use tax rate applies from 94.5% to 95.25%; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104, 11-301, 4-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM