Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, King, and Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include a certain amount in the State budget to the Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education for fiscal years 2021 through 2026 to increase the number of green schools in the State; specifying the purposes for which the funds may be used; requiring that an annual evaluation be conducted in calendar years 2022 through 2027 by an independent contractor with experience evaluating environmental programs; requiring that the evaluation examine certain issues and be provided to certain persons; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {399431/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (103-32) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Text - Chapter - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-117 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:36 AM