Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to establish a certain process for certifying an individual who completes a police training program in another state or military police academy.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0649
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-207, 3-209 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:36 AM