Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh (Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring State and local government units, when destroying records of an individual that contain personal information of the individual, to take reasonable steps to protect against unauthorized access to or use of the personal information under specified circumstances; requiring a government unit that collects specified personal information of an individual to implement and maintain specified security procedures and practices; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0959
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514235/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {514235/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
Senate 4/09/2013 4/07/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1301 through 10-1308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM