Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from recovering specified bedding that is intended to be sold or offered for sale to a consumer in the State unless the person clearly marks the bedding as used; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor and on conviction a person is subject to a maximum fine of $500.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557079/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments {557079/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Referred Economic Matters 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
(   14-1316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page