Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Waldstreicher, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Jennings, King, Kramer, Lee, Patterson, Reilly, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of the Division of Correction to provide a comprehensive rehabilitative prerelease facility for female inmates; requiring the Commissioner to provide evidence-based and gender-responsive prerelease services for certain female inmates; establishing the content for certain services provided by the Commissioner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568676/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-27)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) Withdrawn 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary 49
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (104-27) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM