Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Assisted Customers
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Benson, and Kelley
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, with a certain exception, a retail electricity or natural gas supplier from knowingly enrolling a certain residential customer with or submitting an enrollment to change the customer's electricity supplier to a competitive supplier if the customer had received certain financial assistance in the preceding 12 months; requiring an electric company to confirm certain matters in its records at a certain time; requiring an electric company to verify a customer's status at a certain time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Assisted Customers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Assisted Customers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Assisted Customers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {327672/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Assisted Customers
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Economic Matters 49A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-505, 7-604.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:16 PM