Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance and Annuities - Duty to Search Death Master File and Locate Beneficiaries
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of provisions of law relating to searches of a specified death master file in connection with life insurance policies and annuity contracts issued, delivered, or renewed in the State by specified insurers to exclude a policy of life insurance issued or delivered before a specified date by a specified insurer; requiring specified insurers to establish procedures for periodically contacting specified individuals for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0797
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-118 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM