Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive Representatives
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that an election for exclusive representatives of a State employee bargaining unit be conducted every 4 years; requiring the State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board to decertify exclusive representatives of a State employee bargaining unit under specified circumstances; requiring the boards to contract with an independent third party specializing in conducting elections to conduct elections for exclusive representatives of State employee bargaining units; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-401, 3-402, 3-405, 3-406, 3-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM