Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Energy-Generating Facilities - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Frosh, Montgomery, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program on community energy-generating facilities under the authority of the Public Service Commission; requiring the Commission to adhere to specified guidelines in conducting the pilot program; authorizing the Commission to assess an administrative fee; stating the effectiveness of contracts entered into during the pilot program; prohibiting the Commission or an electric company from changing the terms of a contract entered into during the pilot program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM