Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - General Education Programs - Semester Hour Maximums
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified public institutions of higher education will satisfy a specified general education program requirement by requiring a specified baccalaureate program to include a minimum of 40 semester hours and not more than 46 semester hours of required core courses; authorizing specified public institutions of higher education to include one additional 3 semester hour course in excess of a specified maximum semester hours amount; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM