Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund and Advisory Council - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include $10,000,000 in the annual State budget to the Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund; requiring that the appropriation be composed of at least $5,000,000 in general funds; authorizing the Fund to be used for oversight of the Fund, public outreach and education, and technical assistance and best practice education for grantees; requiring the Executive Director of the Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Advisory Council to oversee certain evaluations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0822
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-4)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-28)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund and Advisory Council - Alterations
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {798176/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund and Advisory Council - Alterations
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Appropriations Judiciary 51
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-4) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (104-28) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM