Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water and Sewer Service
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly that homeowners have access to certain affordability programs for water and sewer services; authorizing a political subdivision, a sanitary commission, or an authority to develop and implement certain affordability programs; authorizing a sanitary commission, a political subdivision, or an authority to disconnect certain service to properties that meet certain criteria; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0923
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Water and Sewer Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Water and Sewer Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - Water and Sewer Service
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Water and Sewer Service
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Environment - Water and Sewer Service
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 43
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Text - Chapter - Environment - Water and Sewer Service
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-202, 9-670, 9-728, 9-951 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM