Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Electronic Courts - Electronic Filing - Sealing of Documents
Sponsored by
Senators Carter and Lam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual who files a document using the system of electronic filing and case management established by the Court of Appeals to request that the document be sealed in a certain manner; requiring the clerk to temporarily seal a certain document pending a determination by the court if the document should be sealed or for a certain period of time; requiring the court to issue a certain order under certain circumstances; and requiring the clerk to make a certain document available to the public under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Electronic Courts - Electronic Filing - Sealing of Documents
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Maryland Electronic Courts - Electronic Filing - Sealing of Documents
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 8:12 PM