Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan Debt
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Garagiola, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Montgomery, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified income of specified individuals from the discharge of student loan debt; providing that the amount of the subtraction modification may not exceed a specified amount for specified taxpayers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0087
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM