Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a unit of State or local government from granting economic aid to specified employers; requiring an employer that receives specified economic aid to adhere to specified terms of employment for a specified period of time; establishing a specified rebuttable presumption; providing that a specified employer may not be required to adhere to a specified term of employment under specified circumstances; requiring that a unit notify specified employers of specified information; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM