Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - Restitution
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain grant made to a certain erroneously convicted individual by the Board of Public Works to include the amounts of certain fines, fees, costs, and restitution; requiring the Board to make a certain grant to a certain individual under certain circumstances; and requiring the Board to use money in the General Emergency Fund or money that the Governor provides in the annual budget in making a certain grant.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - Restitution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - Restitution
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 19
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM