Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health – Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Jennings, Lee, Peters, Serafini, Young, Zucker, Kelley, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Hayes, Hershey, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program in the Department of Health to provide grants to certain fire departments and volunteer fire companies to procure innovative cancer screening tests not generally conducted during routine physical exams or covered by insurance for the purpose of reducing cancer mortality among professional and volunteer firefighters; requiring the Governor for certain fiscal years to include at least $100,000 in the budget for the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1293
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health – Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {927676/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Health – Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing canceled
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text - Chapter - Health – Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3901 through 13-3907 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM