Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy and Job Development
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain criteria for qualified offshore wind projects applied for on or after January 1, 2020; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of energy that must be derived from Tier 1 renewable sources in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of Tier 1 renewable energy that must be derived from solar energy in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1453
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy and Job Development
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Renewable Energy and Job Development
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-708.1, 11-709 )
(   7-701, 7-703, 7-704, 7-704.1, 7-704.2, 7-705, 7-714 )
(   9-20B-01, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM