Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Feldman, Carozza, Guzzone, Peters, Serafini, West, Washington, Waldstreicher, Cassilly, Lee, Smith, Zirkin, Hough, Carter, Ready, and Hester
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to issue a certain order on request of a local department of social services that has been granted certain guardianship over a child in need of assistance to have control over the property of the child for the purpose of establishing an individual savings account, an ABLE account under certain circumstances, or a pooled special needs trust on behalf of the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1283
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child in Need of Assistance - Guardianship by Local Department - ABLE Accounts
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {168379/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Judiciary 47
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text - Chapter - Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801, 3-802, 3-819 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM