Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional Engineers - Responsible Charge - Review and Approval of Engineering Documents
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified engineering documents prepared in connection with specified projects conducted by, jointly with, or under contract with the State or a political subdivision of the State, where specified skills are required, to be signed, sealed, and dated by a professional engineer; and requiring any review or approval by a unit of State or local government of a specified engineering document to be undertaken by a specified professional engineer with responsible charge; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM