Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone Systems - Prepaid Service - Collection of Surcharge
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a prepaid wireless E 9-1-1 fee of 60 cents per retail transaction; providing that the fee shall be collected for specified transactions in the State for the purpose of contributing to the 9-1-1 Trust Fund; authorizing specified percentages of the money collected from the fee to be used for specified purposes; providing that the fee is not subject to the sales and use tax; authorizing a seller to demonstrate a specified exemption from the fee in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0779 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127376/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-8)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {127376/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 37
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-8) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301 through 1-303, 1-308 through 1-311, 1-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM