Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wildlife Management - Shooting at Nighttime
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (14-33)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from authorizing a holder or an agent of a holder of a Deer Management Permit to shoot or discharge a firearm at nighttime.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wildlife Management - Shooting at Nighttime
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504234/1
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504234/1
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {504234/1
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504234/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504234/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {793829/2 (Senator Conway)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {793829/2 (Senator Conway) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Wildlife Management - Shooting at Nighttime
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Failed (14-33)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Wildlife Management - Shooting at Nighttime
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504234/1 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504234/1 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Committee Amendment {504234/1 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Conway) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504234/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Conway) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504234/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {793829/2 (Senator Conway) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Miller) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {793829/2 (Senator Conway) Rejected (13-32) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wildlife Management - Shooting at Nighttime
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Failed (14-33) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
(   10-101, 10-415 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page