Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational Changes
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund is not subject to specified provisions of State law; providing that the Fund is independent of all State units; requiring the Board to employ specified attorneys for specified purposes; removing employees of the Fund from the State Personnel Management System except under specified circumstances; repealing provisions of law that authorize the Legislative Auditor to conduct specified audits of the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1132
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013, July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557272/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-13)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {557272/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (122-13) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-201 through 20-204, 20-303, 20-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM