Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Robey, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to develop and implement the Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program; requiring the Program to be established in multiple regions of the State; requiring the Secretary to coordinate with specified agencies on the establishment of the internships; specifying components of the Program; establishing eligibility standards for the Program; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Secretary of Human Resources, to issue a report to committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1119
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {497479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {497479/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Appropriations 51
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM