Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding certain sources of revenue required to be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund; requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to pay certain fines and penalties into the General Fund of the State; altering certain provisions on the regulation of money transmission by the Commissioner; authorizing the Commissioner to identify certain activities as money transmission for certain purposes; establishing licensing requirements for certain money transmission locations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {867279/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {867279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {867279/1 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {867279/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:17 AM