Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Free School Meals for Students From Low- and Middle-Income Families Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Manno, Pugh, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education adopt and publish standards for the administration of a subsidized feeding program; requiring the State to be responsible for the student share of the costs of specified meals; prohibiting a county board from charging specified students for any portion of the cost of a meal; altering the calculation for the reimbursement for specified meals to specified county boards of education; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1325
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-601 through 7-605, 7-701 through 7-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM