Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, Guzzone, Manno, Pugh, and Raskin
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an optional Breakfast After the Bell Program in the State for specified public schools; providing that the purpose of the Program is to ensure that students enrolled in public schools with a high concentration of low-income students have access to breakfast on school days; requiring specified public schools in specified school years to offer breakfast for free to every student using a delivery method that meets specified requirements; requiring participating public schools to participate for an entire school year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1360
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {319439/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {319439/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 52
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-703, 7-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM