Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Whistleblower Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a Natural Resources Whistleblower Program; establishing the purpose of the Program; requiring the Program to provide rewards of financial compensation under certain circumstances to individuals or nonprofit organizations that report violations of natural resources or conservation laws; establishing the Natural Resources Whistleblower Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Department to administer the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Whistleblower Program - Establishment
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1101.1, 10-1102, 1-211, 4-1202 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:37 AM