Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Potomac Compact for Fair Representation; providing that a party state is not required to comply with the Compact under specified circumstances; establishing the Independent Congressional Districting Commission; requiring the Commission to consider the adoption of a specified Congressional districting plan for a party state, draw and adopt a specified congressional districting plan for a party state before a specified deadline, operate in a specified manner, and solicit public feedback; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-06, 8-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM